Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ngogi Nkongolo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1916Born
5 May 194629.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 195942.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Apr 195942.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebedus
1 Jul 195943.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebedus
10 Nov 195943.3AppointedBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 May 196649.8AppointedBishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Nov 199175.4RetiredBishop of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Oct 199983.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbujimayi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ngogi Nkongolo
Bishop Joseph Ngogi Nkongolo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbujimayi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHemptinne Saint Benoît

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 64
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Feb 2017