Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emery Kabongo Kanundowi

Bishop Emeritus of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1940 Born
15 Aug 196929.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 198747.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jan 198847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Feb 198847.5InstalledBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Aug 200363.0ResignedBishop of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emery Kabongo Kanundowi (VIAF: 73546351)
Archbishop Emery Kabongo Kanundowi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Luebo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBena-Kazadi-Tshikula, Vicariate Apostolic of Kasaď Superiore
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Luebo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,423
  • i/bpd: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 May 2020

Quantcast