Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Pyone Cho

Bishop of Pyay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1949 BornOatshitpin
15 Mar 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Prome, Myanmar
3 Dec 201061.4AppointedBishop of Pyay, Myanmar
27 Feb 201161.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pyay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Alexander Pyone Cho:
Bishop Alexander Pyone Cho (born ) Bishop of Pyay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pyay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2010
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,961

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013