Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Thailand



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Tschang In-Nam, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Split: 25 April 1969
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Thailand
  • Mailing Address: 217 Sathorn Tai Road, Bangkok 10120, Thailand
  • Telephone: (66-2)212.58.53/4
  • Fax: 212.09.32

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Thailand and the Malacca Peninsula
27 November 1957EstablishedDelegation to Thailand and the Malacca Peninsula
Delegation to Thailand, Laos and the Malacca Peninsula
10 February 1964Name ChangedDelegation to Thailand and the Malacca Peninsula Delegation to Thailand, Laos and the Malacca Peninsula
Delegation to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
13 November 1967Name ChangedDelegation to Thailand, Laos and the Malacca Peninsula Delegation to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
25 April 1969SplitDelegation to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore Delegation to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
Nunciature to Thailand
Nunciature to Thailand
25 April 1969SplitDelegation to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore Delegation to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
Nunciature to Thailand

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.3.0, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Oct 2019

Quantcast