Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Jadot

Deceased

Pro-President Emeritus of the Secretariat of Non-Christians

Titular Archbishop of Zuri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1909Born
11 Feb 193424.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 196858.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zuri
24 Feb 196858.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
1 May 196858.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Zuri
28 Aug 196959.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Thailand
28 Aug 196959.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
15 May 197161.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Equatorial Guinea
15 May 197161.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gabon
15 May 197161.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cameroun
23 May 197363.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
27 Jun 198070.5AppointedPro-President of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
8 Apr 198474.3RetiredPro-President of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
21 Jan 200999.1DiedPro-President Emeritus of the Secretariat of Non-Christians

MicroData Summary for Jean Jadot (VIAF: 71482906)
Archbishop Jean Jadot (born , died ) Pro-President Emeritus of Non-Christians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles, Belgium

  • a priest for 74.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Mar 2019

Quantcast