Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adriano Bernardini

Apostolic Nuncio to Italy

Titular Archbishop of Falerii

Apostolic Nuncio to San Marino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1942 BornPian di Meleto, Italy
31 Mar 196825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Aug 199250.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Falerii
20 Aug 199250.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh
15 Nov 199250.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Falerii
15 Jun 199653.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Madagascar
15 Jun 199653.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritius
15 Jun 199653.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Thailand
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Singapore
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cambodia
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
24 Jul 199956.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
26 Apr 200360.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
15 Nov 201169.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
15 Nov 201169.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to San Marino

MicroData Summary for Adriano Bernardini:
Archbishop Adriano Bernardini (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Italy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,933
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014