Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Selvadagi

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Salapia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1946 BornRoma
8 Dec 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Jun 201366.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Jun 201366.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Salapia
7 Sep 201367.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salapia

MicroData Summary for Paolo Selvadagi:
Bishop Paolo Selvadagi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Jun 2013
  • c34: CB, 6 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013