Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Iannone, O. Carm.

President of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1957 Born
1 Oct 197719.8ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Oct 198022.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
26 Jun 198224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
12 Apr 200143.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Apr 200143.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nebbi
26 May 200143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nebbi
19 Jun 200951.5AppointedBishop of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo, Italy
31 Jan 201254.1AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 201254.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
11 Nov 201759.9AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
7 Apr 201860.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

MicroData Summary for Filippo Iannone (VIAF: 88869352)
Archbishop Filippo Iannone O. Carm. (born ) President of Legislative Texts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,979
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 7 Apr 2018