Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Di Donna

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1952 Born
14 Apr 197623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
4 Oct 200755.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
4 Oct 200755.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
11 Nov 200755.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
18 Sep 201361.0AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Di Donna
Bishop Antonio Di Donna (born ) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErcolano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acerra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,562
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018