Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciro Miniero

Bishop of Vallo della Lucania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1958 BornNapoli
19 Jun 198224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 May 201153.3AppointedBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy
19 Jun 201153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy
4 Sep 201153.6InstalledBishop of Vallo della Lucania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ciro Miniero:
Bishop Ciro Miniero (born ) Bishop of Vallo della Lucania

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vallo della Lucania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,079
  • i: CB, 30 Aug 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013