Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianrico Ruzza

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Subaugusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1963 BornRoma
16 May 198724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
8 Apr 201653.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
8 Apr 201653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
11 Jun 201653.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subaugusta

MicroData Summary for Gianrico Ruzza
Bishop Gianrico Ruzza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Apr 2016
  • c3+: CB, 8 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,936

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016