Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dario Gervasi

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Subaugusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1968 Born
22 May 199426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Aug 202052.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Aug 202052.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
18 Oct 202052.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subaugusta

MicroData Summary for Dario Gervasi
Father Dario Gervasi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2020
  • c1/ob: CB, 31 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 31 Aug 2020

Quantcast