Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Ricciardi

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Gabii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1968 Born
2 May 199325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Nov 201749.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Nov 201749.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabii
13 Jan 201849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabii

MicroData Summary for Paolo Ricciardi (VIAF: 254987144)
Bishop Paolo Ricciardi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 23 Nov 2017
  • c34: CB, 9 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018