Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Turazzi

Bishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1948 Born
27 May 197223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ferrara, Italy
30 Nov 201365.2AppointedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
25 Jan 201465.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
2 Mar 201465.5InstalledBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Turazzi
Bishop Andrea Turazzi (born ) Bishop of San Marino-Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStellata di Bondeno
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Ferrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara-Comacchio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 11 Dec 2013
  • c34: CB, 21 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,079
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018