Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dicastery for Legislative Texts

Dicasterium de Legum Textibus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Filippo Iannone, O. Carm., Prefect
  • Juan Ignacio Arrieta Ochoa de Chinchetru, Secretary
  • Markus Graulich, S.D.B., Under Secretary
  • Francesco Coccopalmerio, Cardinal, President Emeritus
  • JuliŠn Herranz Casado, Cardinal, President Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Dicastery
  • Elevated: 5 June 2022
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: Promotes and encourages in the Church the understanding and acceptance of the canonical law of the Latin Church and that of the Eastern Churches and offers assistance for its correct application (Praedicate Evangelium, 175)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.delegumtextibus.va/
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/pontifical_councils/intrptxt/
  • Mailing Address: 00193 Roma, Palazzo delle Congregazioni, Piazza Pio XII, 10
  • Telephone: 06.69.88.40.08
  • Fax: 06.69.88.47.10

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
15 September 1917EstablishedPontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
28 March 1963Name ChangedPontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
2 January 1984Name ChangedPontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
28 June 1988ElevatedPontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
27 February 1991Territory AddedPontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Oriental Canon Law (suppressed) Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
1999Name ChangedPontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
Dicastery for Legislative Texts
5 June 2022ElevatedPontifical Council for Legislative Texts Dicastery for Legislative Texts

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 76, Page 433, and Page 434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 5 Jun 2023