Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pericle Cardinal Felici

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1911BornSegni
28 Oct 193322.2Ordained PriestPriest of Segni, Italy
3 Sep 196049.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Samosata
3 Sep 196049.1AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
28 Oct 196049.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Samosata
21 Feb 196755.6AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
26 Jun 196755.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
26 Jun 196755.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196755.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law
15 Aug 197766.0AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
30 Jun 197967.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
22 Mar 198270.6DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Pericle Felici:
Cardinal Pericle Felici (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013