Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julián Cardinal Herranz Casado

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eugenio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1930 BornBaena, Spain
7 Aug 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
198352.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
15 Dec 199060.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vertara
6 Jan 199160.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vertara
19 Dec 199464.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Interpretation of Legislative Texts
21 Oct 200373.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eugenio
21 Oct 200373.5Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 200575.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
21 Apr 200575.0ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
15 Feb 200776.8RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
12 Jun 201484.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eugenio

MicroData Summary for Julián Herranz Casado:
Julián Cardinal Herranz Casado (born ) President Emeritus of Legislative Texts

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,306
  • ab: CB, 12 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015