Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Sincero

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1870BornTrino Vercellese
24 Sep 189222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Oct 191747.5AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
1923¹52.7ResignedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
23 May 192353.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 192353.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
6 Feb 192655.8AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
3 Feb 192756.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
17 Dec 192858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
11 Jan 192958.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
13 Jan 192958.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
13 Mar 193362.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Nov 193464.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Codification of Oriental Canon Law
12 Dec 193464.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
16 Jul 193565.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Redaction of the Code of Oriental Canon Law
7 Feb 193665.8DiedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Sincero
Luigi Cardinal Sincero (born , died ) Secretary of Oriental Churches

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 1 May 2016