Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bondini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1872Born
29 Sep 192957.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
20 Oct 192957.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
18 Dec 193664.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Perge

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bondini
Bishop Luigi Bondini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Perge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast