Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Tramma

Deceased

Official of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1931Born
27 May 195422.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 199058.5AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
9 Sep 199058.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
25 Mar 199967.3AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
1 Nov 200068.9DiedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

MicroData Summary for Umberto Tramma (VIAF: 89727251)
Bishop Umberto Tramma (born , died ) Official of Legislative Texts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,190
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018