Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pagano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1922Born
27 Jun 194826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Aug 197755.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Aug 197755.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissita
9 Oct 197755.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissita
18 Dec 198361.5AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
25 Nov 199775.5RetiredBishop of Ischia, Italy
9 Mar 200178.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pagano
Bishop Antonio Pagano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre Annunziata

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018