Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Zama

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1917Born
16 Jun 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Oct 196750.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Oct 196750.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
8 Dec 196750.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
27 Aug 197760.6AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
27 Aug 197760.6AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
30 Sep 198669.6AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
7 Jul 198871.4DiedArchbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Zama
Archbishop Antonio Zama (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017