Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Aiello

Bishop of Avellino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1955 Born
7 Jul 197924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
13 May 200650.9AppointedBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
30 Jun 200651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
16 Jul 200651.1InstalledBishop of Teano-Calvi, Italy
6 May 201761.9AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
30 Jun 201762.1InstalledBishop of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arturo Aiello
Bishop Arturo Aiello (born ) Bishop of Avellino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVico Equense
Ordained BishopCampo sportivo di Piano, Sorrento, Archdiocese of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Avellino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,179
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017