Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ambrosanio

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1928Born
19 Mar 195122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Aug 197749.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Aug 197749.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
9 Oct 197749.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
4 Jan 198859.3AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
7 Feb 199566.4DiedArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ambrosanio (VIAF: 87801331)
Archbishop Antonio Ambrosanio (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto-Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017