Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Bottaccioli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1928Born
1 Oct 195022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gubbio, Italy
26 Apr 198961.1AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
16 May 198961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
23 Dec 200476.8RetiredBishop of Gubbio, Italy
22 Jan 201788.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bottaccioli (VIAF: 160254331)
Bishop Pietro Bottaccioli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUmbertide

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,348
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017