Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Ceccobelli

Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1941 Born
3 Sep 196625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy
23 Dec 200463.3AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
29 Jan 200563.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
6 Feb 200563.4InstalledBishop of Gubbio, Italy
29 Sep 201776.1RetiredBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Ceccobelli
Bishop Mario Ceccobelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsciano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gubbio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,814
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast