Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Chiaretti

Archbishop Emeritus of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1933 Born
8 Dec 195522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Spoleto, Italy
7 Apr 198349.9AppointedBishop of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto, Italy
7 Apr 198349.9AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
15 May 198350.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto, Italy
30 Sep 198653.4AppointedBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy
9 Dec 199562.6AppointedArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
28 Jan 199662.7InstalledArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy
16 Jul 200976.2RetiredArchbishop of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Chiaretti
Archbishop Giuseppe Chiaretti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonessa, Archdiocese of Spoleto
Ordained PriestLeonessa, Archdiocese of Spoleto
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Spoleto, Archdiocese of Spoleto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Perugia-Cittą della Pieve.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,631
  • opd/c1: AM, 25 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Jul 2021

Quantcast