Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciriaco Scanzillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Polymartium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1920BornNapoli
24 Apr 194322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Mar 198968.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Mar 198968.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Polymartium
13 May 198969.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polymartium
11 Mar 199675.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
31 May 200484.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ciriaco Scanzillo:
Bishop Ciriaco Scanzillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,248
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 5 Nov 2014