Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Massimo Camisasca, F.S.C.B.

Bishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1946 BornMilano
4 Nov 197529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
14 Sep 198538.8ProfessedPriest of Fraternitą Sacerdotale dei Missionari di San Carlo Borromeo
19 Mar 199952.3AppointedSuperior General of Fraternitą Sacerdotale dei Missionari di San Carlo Borromeo
29 Sep 201265.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
7 Dec 201266.0Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
16 Dec 201266.1InstalledBishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Massimo Camisasca:
Bishop Massimo Camisasca F.S.C.B. (born ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2012
  • ob: CB, 30 Sep 2012
  • c2+: CB, 26 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,611
  • c1/i: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015