Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Gianotti

Bishop of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1957 Born
12 Sep 198123.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Reggio Emilia, Italy
19 Jun 198224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
11 Jan 201759.3AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
19 Mar 201759.5Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
2 Apr 201759.5InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniele Gianotti (VIAF: 248776585)
Bishop Daniele Gianotti (born ) Bishop of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalerno
Ordained PriestCalerno
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crema.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jan 2017
  • c34: CB, 31 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017