Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Cantoni

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1950 BornLenno
28 Jun 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
25 Jan 200554.3AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
5 Mar 200554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
19 Mar 200554.5InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oscar Cantoni
Bishop Oscar Cantoni (born ) Bishop of Crema

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crema.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016