Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teresio Ferraroni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1913Born
6 Jun 193622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 196652.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 196652.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gauriana
8 Jan 196753.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gauriana
12 Sep 197056.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Como, Italy
22 Feb 197359.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Como, Italy
1 Nov 197460.8SucceededBishop of Como, Italy
31 Jan 198975.1RetiredBishop of Como, Italy
4 Sep 200793.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teresio Ferraroni (VIAF: 90248288)
Bishop Teresio Ferraroni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaggiano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSanto Stefano, Church, Sesto San Giovanni, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceLecco, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Duomo Canons Chapel, Cemetery, Como, Diocese of Como
Buried Place (Current)Sant’Abbondio, Basilica, Como, Diocese of Como

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 25 Feb 2018
  • c1/loc: AM, 11 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast