Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Lafranconi

Bishop Emeritus of Cremona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1940 BornMandello del Lario
28 Jun 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
7 Dec 199151.7AppointedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
25 Jan 199251.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
8 Sep 200161.4AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
4 Nov 200161.6InstalledBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 Nov 201575.6RetiredBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dante Lafranconi
Bishop Dante Lafranconi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cremona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,654
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016