Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eliseo Antonio Ariotti

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Paraguay

Titular Archbishop of Vibiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1948 Born
7 May 197526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
17 Jul 200354.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vibiana
17 Jul 200354.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cameroun
5 Aug 200354.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea
5 Oct 200354.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vibiana
5 Nov 200960.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
29 Dec 202375.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Eliseo Antonio Ariotti
(VIAF: 14155226736684490003; WikiData: Q1330693)
Archbishop Eliseo Antonio Ariotti (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Paraguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVailate, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Ordained PriestSanta Maria del Fonte, Shrine, Caravaggio, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Cremona, Diocese of Cremona, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Paraguay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,471
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: AM, 30 Sep 2022
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 29 Dec 2023