Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Amari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1916BornS. Nicolò Po
16 Jun 194023.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 197356.5AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
18 Mar 197356.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
15 Mar 197861.5AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
30 Jun 199275.8RetiredBishop of Verona, Italy
8 Aug 200487.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Amari:
Bishop Giuseppe Amari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verona

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013