Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Zenti

Bishop of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1947 BornSan Martino Buon Albergo
26 Jun 197124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
3 Dec 200356.7AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
11 Jan 200456.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
1 Feb 200456.9InstalledBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
8 May 200760.2AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
30 Jun 200760.3InstalledBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zenti:
Bishop Giuseppe Zenti (born ) Bishop of Verona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,508
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013