Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Magarotto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vittorio Veneto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1927Born
9 Jul 195023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Jan 1989³61.8AppointedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
17 Sep 198962.5CeasedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
22 Feb 199063.0AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
24 Mar 199063.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Apr 199063.1InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy
31 May 199770.2AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
29 Jun 199770.3InstalledBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
3 Dec 200376.7RetiredBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
1 Jul 200780.3AppointedAdministrator of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
26 Jan 200880.9CeasedAdministrator of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
22 Jan 202193.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vittorio Veneto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Magarotto
Bishop Alfredo Magarotto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vittorio Veneto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePernumia, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Death PlaceOpera della Provvidenza Sant'Antonio, Sarmeola di Rubàno, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,865
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d/i: CB, 22 Jan 2021
  • loc/admi: AM, 23 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Jan 2021

Quantcast