Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Galli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fidenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1936BornSoresina
27 May 196124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
2 Apr 199861.4AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
2 May 199861.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
30 Jun 200770.6ResignedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
1 Jun 200871.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Galli:
Bishop Maurizio Galli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fidenza

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,321
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013