Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Veggio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy

Titular Bishop of Velia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1923Born
29 Jun 194723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
1 Aug 198359.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verona, Italy
1 Aug 198359.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Velia
8 Sep 198360.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velia
8 Sep 199774.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Verona, Italy
3 Oct 199875.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Verona, Italy
8 Sep 200178.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Verona, Italy
6 Jun 202096.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Veggio
Bishop Andrea Veggio (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManerba del Garda
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Matricolare, Cathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona
Death PlaceNegrar, Diocese of Verona
Buried Place (Original)Cripta dei Vescovi, Cathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona

  • a priest for 72.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Jun 2020
  • loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast