Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maffeo Giovanni Ducoli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belluno-Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1918Born
30 May 194223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
22 Apr 196748.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verona, Italy
22 Apr 196748.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidenae
14 May 196748.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fidenae
7 Oct 197556.9AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
2 Feb 199677.2RetiredBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
28 Aug 201293.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Belluno-Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Giovanni Ducoli
Bishop Maffeo Giovanni Ducoli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belluno-Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Mauro di Saline

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Aug 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018