Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Mbarga

Archbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1956 Born
5 Dec 198125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
15 Oct 200448.4AppointedBishop of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon
5 Dec 200448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ebolowa-Kribi, Cameroon
29 Jul 201357.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yaoundé, Cameroon
31 Oct 201458.4AppointedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jean Mbarga
Archbishop Jean Mbarga (born ) Archbishop of Yaoundé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbolmedzo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Yaoundé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,720
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018