Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Befe Ateba

Deceased

Bishop of Kribi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1962BornNkoabe
20 Jun 198725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
19 Jun 200846.2AppointedBishop of Kribi, Cameroon
4 Oct 200846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kribi, Cameroon
4 Jun 201452.1DiedBishop of Kribi, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Befe Ateba:
Bishop Joseph Befe Ateba (born , died ) Bishop of Kribi

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,976
  • d: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014