Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Scampa

Bishop Emeritus of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1944 Born
27 Jun 197127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cremona, Italy
30 Oct 200258.7AppointedBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
5 Jan 200358.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
22 Jan 202075.9RetiredBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Scampa
Bishop Carmelo Scampa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luís de Montes Belos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScandolara Ripa d’Olio, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Cremona, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, São Luís de Montes Belos, Diocese of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Luís de Montes Belos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,299
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2020
  • opd/c1: AM, 29 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 30 Jan 2020

Quantcast