Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Aldo Cerrato, C.O.

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1949 Born
28 Jun 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
1994²44.2AppointedProcurator General of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
28 Jul 201262.7AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
8 Sep 201262.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
7 Oct 201262.9InstalledBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Aldo Cerrato (VIAF: 76646044)
Bishop Edoardo Aldo Cerrato C.O. (born ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ivrea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2012
  • ob/i/c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast