Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Mansi

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1952 BornCerignola
29 Jun 197523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
29 Jan 201663.7AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
12 Mar 201663.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
3 Apr 201663.9InstalledBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Mansi
Bishop Luigi Mansi (born ) Bishop of Andria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Andria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2016
  • c1: CB, 30 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 Feb 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 8 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016