Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Calabro

Bishop Emeritus of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1940 BornMinervino di Lecce
15 Mar 196423.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 198848.3AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
6 Jan 198948.4Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
29 Jan 201675.5RetiredBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Calabro
Bishop Raffaele Calabro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Andria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Andria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,028
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 29 Jan 2016