Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Tan Chee Ing, S.J.

Bishop of Melaka-Johor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1940 BornMuar
21 Jun 197131.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 197938.8IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
13 Feb 200362.9AppointedBishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia
15 May 200363.1Ordained BishopBishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Paul Tan Chee Ing:
Bishop Paul Tan Chee Ing S.J. (born ) Bishop of Melaka-Johor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melaka-Johor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013