Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Francis

Bishop of Penang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1951 BornJohor Bahru
28 Jul 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia
7 Jul 201260.7AppointedBishop of Penang, Malaysia
20 Aug 201260.8Ordained BishopBishop of Penang, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Francis:
Bishop Sebastian Francis (born ) Bishop of Penang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Penang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 12 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 13 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,528

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013