Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregory Yong Sooi Ngean

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1925BornBatu Gajah
3 Dec 195126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Penang, Malaysia
9 Apr 196842.9AppointedBishop of Penang, Malaysia
1 Jul 196843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Penang, Malaysia
3 Feb 197751.7AppointedArchbishop of Singapore
2 Apr 197751.9InstalledArchbishop of Singapore
14 Oct 200075.4RetiredArchbishop of Singapore
28 Jun 200883.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Singapore

MicroData Summary for Gregory Yong Sooi Ngean:
Archbishop Gregory Yong Sooi Ngean (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Singapore

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013