Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Ha Tiong Hock

Archbishop of Kuching


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1947 BornKuching
14 Dec 197225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kuching, Malaysia
17 Jan 199850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kuching, Malaysia
17 Jan 199850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Canapium
6 Jun 199851.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canapium
21 Jun 200356.3AppointedArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia
16 Jul 200356.4InstalledArchbishop of Kuching, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for John Ha Tiong Hock:
Archbishop John Ha Tiong Hock (born ) Archbishop of Kuching

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kuching.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Oct 2014